Most Rev. PETEr a COMENSOLI DD
Archbishop of Melbourne
Ordained priest, 22 May 1992
Ordained bishop, 20 November 2014
Appointed Archbishop of Melbourne, 29 June 2018
Read Archbishop Comensoli's Biography
Most Rev. Julian C Porteous DD
Archbishop of Hobart
Ordained priest, 7 September 1974
Ordained bishop, 3 September 2003
Appointed Archbishop of Hobart, 19 July 2013
Read Archbishop Porteous' Biography
Most Rev. shane mackinlay DD
Bishop of Sandhurst
Ordained priest 6 September 1991
Ordained bishop, 16 October 2019
Appointed Bishop of Sandhurst, 16 October 2019
Read Bishop Mackinlay's Biography
Most Rev. Paul Bird CSsR MA DD
Bishop of Ballarat
Ordained priest, 17 May 1975
Ordained bishop, 16 October 2012
Appointed Bishop of Ballarat, 1 August 2012
Read Bishop Bird's Biography
Most Rev. GREGORY BENNET DD
Bishop of Sale
Ordained priest, 22 August 1992
Ordained bishop, 8 December 2020
Appointed Bishop of Sale, 27 June 2020
Read Bishop Bennet's Biography
AUXILIARY BISHOPS OF MELBOURNE
Most Rev. Terence Curtin STD DD
Ordained priest 28 August 1971
Ordained bishop 17 December 2014
Appointed Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne 7 Nov 2014
Read Bishop Curtin's Biography
MOST REV. ANTHONY JOHN IRELAND
Ordained priest 19 September 1987
Ordained bishop 31 July 2021 Appointed Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne 14 May 2021 Read Bishop Ireland’s Biography
MOST REV. MARTIN ASHE
Ordained priest 11 June 1978 Ordained bishop 31 July 2021 Appointed Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne 14 May 2021 Read Bishop Ashe’s Biography